Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 07/22/1987
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 07/22/1987
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 07/22/1987
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA]* 07/22/1987
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 07/22/1987
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 07/22/1987
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 07/22/1987
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 07/22/1987
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 07/22/1987
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN]* 07/22/1987
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 07/22/1987
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA]* 07/22/1987
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 07/22/1987
Sen. Weicker, Lowell P., Jr. [R-CT]* 07/22/1987
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 08/07/1987
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 08/07/1987
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 09/16/1987
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 09/16/1987
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/23/1987
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/30/1987
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/30/1987
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 10/08/1987
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 10/08/1987
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 10/08/1987
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 10/09/1987
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 10/09/1987
Sen. Trible, Paul S., Jr. [R-VA] 10/20/1987
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 10/20/1987
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 10/23/1987
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/23/1987
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 10/27/1987
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT] 10/27/1987
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 11/19/1987
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 12/11/1987
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 12/16/1987
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 02/17/1988
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/17/1988
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 02/17/1988
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 02/17/1988
Sen. Karnes, David K. [R-NE] 02/19/1988
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/19/1988
Sen. Armstrong, William L. [R-CO] 02/24/1988
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 02/26/1988
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 02/29/1988
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 03/04/1988
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 03/16/1988
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 03/16/1988
Sen. Hecht, Chic [R-NV] 03/16/1988
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID] 03/16/1988
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 03/16/1988
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/17/1988
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/22/1988
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/22/1988
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 03/22/1988
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/22/1988
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 03/25/1988
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 03/25/1988
Sen. Stennis, John C. [D-MS] 03/25/1988
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 03/25/1988
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/25/1988
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 03/29/1988
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 03/29/1988
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 04/14/1988
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT] 04/18/1988
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 04/25/1988
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 04/26/1988
Sen. Evans, Daniel J. [R-WA] 04/26/1988
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 04/28/1988
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 05/10/1988
Sen. Chiles, Lawton [D-FL] 05/10/1988
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 05/16/1988
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 05/16/1988
Sen. Quayle, Dan [R-IN] 05/16/1988
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 06/14/1988
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 06/14/1988
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 06/16/1988
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/29/1988
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 08/01/1988
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 08/10/1988
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 09/13/1988
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 09/23/1988

Show cosponsors who withdrew