Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 07/29/1987
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 07/29/1987
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT]* 07/29/1987
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 09/15/1987
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 09/15/1987
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 09/15/1987
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 09/30/1987
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 09/30/1987
Sen. Karnes, David K. [R-NE] 10/01/1987
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 10/02/1987
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 10/02/1987
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 10/08/1987
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 10/13/1987
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 10/16/1987
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 10/16/1987
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 10/20/1987
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 10/20/1987
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 10/28/1987
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 11/12/1987