Committees: S.1693 — 100th Congress (1987-1988)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources09/17/1987 Referred to
05/18/1988 Markup by
05/27/1988 Reported by S.Rept 100-367
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks and Forests09/17/1987 Referred to
03/24/1988 Hearings by
House Interior and Insular Affairs06/07/1988 Referred to
09/22/1988 Markup by
House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands06/17/1988 Referred to
09/16/1988 Hearings by
09/16/1988 Markup by
09/16/1988 Reported by