Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to designate the Federal Building located at 1801 Gulf Breeze Parkway, Gulf Breeze, Florida, as the "Bob Sikes Visitor Center".


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/16/1988Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
04/25/1988Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported to Senate by Senator Burdick without amendment. Without written report.
09/30/1987Introduced in Senate

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
06/06/1988HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Surface Transportation.
Action By: Committee on Public Works and Transportation
06/06/1988HouseExecutive Comment Requested from DOT, OMB.
06/06/1988HouseReferred to Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
05/24/1988HouseReferred to House Committee on Public Works and Transportation.
05/24/1988HouseReferred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
05/19/1988SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/16/1988SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
05/16/1988SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
05/16/1988SenateS.Amdt.2095 Amendment SP 2095 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
05/16/1988SenateS.Amdt.2095 Proposed by Senator Byrd for Senator Metzenbaum. To improve the transportation system in the State of Ohio.
04/25/1988SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 636.
04/25/1988SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported to Senate by Senator Burdick without amendment. Without written report.
04/22/1988SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
09/30/1987SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 04/26/1988

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Environment and Public Works09/30/1987 Referred to
04/22/1988 Markup by
04/25/1988 Reported by
House Interior and Insular Affairs05/24/1988 Referred to
House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands06/06/1988 Referred to
House Public Works and Transportation05/24/1988 Referred to
House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Surface Transportation06/06/1988 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1736. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (05/16/1988)

(Measure passed Senate, amended)

Designates the Federal building at 1801 Gulf Breeze Parkway, Gulf Breeze, Florida, as the Bob Sikes Visitor Center.

Directs the Secretary of Transportation, upon the request of the Ohio Turnpike Commission, to enter into an agreement providing that toll revenues from the Ohio Turnpike facility will be used only on such facility for construction and reconstruction costs and for the costs necessary for the proper operation and debt service of such facility. Voids a previous agreement entered into with the Commission and the State of Ohio.