Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to modernize United States circulating coin designs, of which one reverse will have a theme of the Bicentennial of the Constitution.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/14/1988Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
06/23/1988Committee on Banking. Reported to Senate by Senator Proxmire with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 100-396.
10/08/1987Introduced in Senate

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
10/01/1988HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Consumer Affairs and Coinage.
Action By: Committee on Banking, Finance, and Urban Affairs
09/16/1988HouseReferred to House Committee on Banking, Finance and Urban Affairs.
09/16/1988SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/14/1988SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
06/23/1988SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 756.
06/23/1988SenateCommittee on Banking. Reported to Senate by Senator Proxmire with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 100-396.
05/24/1988SenateCommittee on Banking. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
04/22/1988SenateCommittee on Banking. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 100-627.
04/22/1988SenateS.Amdt.1974 Referred to the Committee on Banking.
04/22/1988SenateS.Amdt.1975 Referred to the Committee on Banking.
04/22/1988SenateS.Amdt.1973 Referred to the Committee on Banking.
10/08/1987SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Banking.

Cosponsors (67)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 10/08/1987
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY]* 10/08/1987
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY]* 10/08/1987
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 10/08/1987
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 10/08/1987
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 10/22/1987
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 10/22/1987
Sen. Humphrey, Gordon J. [R-NH] 10/22/1987
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID] 10/22/1987
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 11/04/1987
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 11/04/1987
Sen. Karnes, David K. [R-NE] 11/04/1987
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 11/04/1987
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 11/04/1987
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 11/13/1987
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 11/13/1987
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 11/13/1987
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 11/13/1987
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 11/13/1987
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 11/19/1987
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 11/19/1987
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 11/19/1987
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 11/20/1987
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 12/02/1987
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 12/02/1987
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 02/02/1988
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 02/02/1988
Sen. Quayle, Dan [R-IN] 02/02/1988
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 02/02/1988
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 02/02/1988
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 02/02/1988
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 02/16/1988
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 02/16/1988
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 02/16/1988
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 02/16/1988
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/16/1988
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 02/22/1988
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/26/1988
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/03/1988
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/03/1988
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 03/15/1988
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/17/1988
Sen. Stennis, John C. [D-MS] 03/17/1988
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/17/1988
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/17/1988
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/21/1988
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 03/21/1988
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 03/21/1988
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 03/21/1988
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 03/24/1988
Sen. Chiles, Lawton [D-FL] 03/24/1988
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 03/29/1988
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 03/29/1988
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 04/11/1988
Sen. Evans, Daniel J. [R-WA] 04/11/1988
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 04/13/1988
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 04/13/1988
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 04/19/1988
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 04/19/1988
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 04/19/1988
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 04/22/1988
Sen. Weicker, Lowell P., Jr. [R-CT] 04/26/1988
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 04/26/1988
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 05/09/1988
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 05/09/1988
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 05/13/1988
Sen. Hecht, Chic [R-NV] 07/07/1988

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs10/08/1987 Referred to
04/22/1988 Hearings by
05/24/1988 Markup by
06/23/1988 Reported by S.Rept 100-396
House Banking, Finance, and Urban Affairs09/16/1988 Referred to
House Banking, Finance, and Urban Affrs Subcommittee on Consumer Affairs and Coinage10/01/1988 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.1776.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.1776. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (09/14/1988)

(Measure passed Senate, amended)

Requires U.S. coins to be redesigned, at the discretion of the Secretary of the Treasury, over the next six years. Requires the reverse side of the first coin redesigned to commemorate the bicentennial of the U.S. Constitution for a two-year period.

Provides that the design on the obverse side of U.S. coins shall contain the likenesses of those displayed on current coins and shall be considered for redesign. Requires any such obverse redesigns to conform to the inscription requirements of current law.

Requires the Secretary, in selecting new designs, to consider specified constitutional concepts. Requires the designs be selected by the Secretary upon consultation with the United States Commission of Fine Arts.

Requires that any profits from the sale of uncirculated and proof sets of U.S. coins be deposited in the Treasury and used solely to reduce the national debt.