Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 10/08/1987
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY]* 10/08/1987
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY]* 10/08/1987
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 10/08/1987
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 10/08/1987
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 10/22/1987
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 10/22/1987
Sen. Humphrey, Gordon J. [R-NH] 10/22/1987
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID] 10/22/1987
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 11/04/1987
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 11/04/1987
Sen. Karnes, David K. [R-NE] 11/04/1987
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 11/04/1987
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 11/04/1987
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 11/13/1987
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 11/13/1987
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 11/13/1987
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 11/13/1987
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 11/13/1987
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 11/19/1987
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 11/19/1987
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 11/19/1987
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 11/20/1987
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 12/02/1987
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 12/02/1987
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 02/02/1988
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 02/02/1988
Sen. Quayle, Dan [R-IN] 02/02/1988
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 02/02/1988
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 02/02/1988
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 02/02/1988
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 02/16/1988
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 02/16/1988
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 02/16/1988
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 02/16/1988
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/16/1988
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 02/22/1988
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/26/1988
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/03/1988
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/03/1988
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 03/15/1988
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/17/1988
Sen. Stennis, John C. [D-MS] 03/17/1988
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/17/1988
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/17/1988
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/21/1988
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 03/21/1988
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 03/21/1988
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 03/21/1988
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 03/24/1988
Sen. Chiles, Lawton [D-FL] 03/24/1988
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 03/29/1988
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 03/29/1988
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 04/11/1988
Sen. Evans, Daniel J. [R-WA] 04/11/1988
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 04/13/1988
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 04/13/1988
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 04/19/1988
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 04/19/1988
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 04/19/1988
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 04/22/1988
Sen. Weicker, Lowell P., Jr. [R-CT] 04/26/1988
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 04/26/1988
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 05/09/1988
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 05/09/1988
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 05/13/1988
Sen. Hecht, Chic [R-NV] 07/07/1988