Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

National Historical Publications and Records Commission Amendments of 1988

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

National Historical Publications and Records Commission Amendments of 1988

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

National Historical Publications and Records Commission Amendment Act of 1987

Short Titles as Introduced

National Historical Publications and Records Commission Amendment Act of 1987

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend chapter 25 of title 44, United States Code, to provide an authorization for the National Historical Publications and Records Commission programs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
07/13/1988Became Public Law No: 100-365.
07/13/1988Signed by President.
07/06/1988Presented to President.
06/30/1988Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House by Voice Vote.
06/13/1988Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote.
05/09/1988Committee on Governmental Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Glenn with amendments. With written report No. 100-330.
11/05/1987Introduced in Senate

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
07/13/1988Became Public Law No: 100-365.
07/13/1988Signed by President.
07/06/1988SenatePresented to President.
07/06/1988SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
06/30/1988HousePassed House by Voice Vote.
06/30/1988HouseCalled up by House by Unanimous Consent.
06/15/1988SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/13/1988SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote.
06/13/1988SenateMeasure laid before Senate.
06/13/1988SenateS.Amdt.2346 Amendment SP 2346 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
06/13/1988SenateS.Amdt.2346 Proposed by Senator Byrd for Senator Sasser. To amend chapter 25 of title 44, United States Code, to provide an authorization for the National Historical Publications and Records Commission programs, and for other purposes.
05/09/1988SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 651.
05/09/1988SenateCommittee on Governmental Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Glenn with amendments. With written report No. 100-330.
04/14/1988SenateCommittee on Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
12/15/1987SenateSubcommittee on Government Efficiency, Federalism. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Governmental Affairs Subcommittee on Government Efficiency, Federalism, and the District of Columbia
11/05/1987SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Governmental Affairs11/05/1987 Referred to
04/14/1988 Markup by
05/09/1988 Reported by S.Rept 100-330
Senate Governmental Affairs Subcommittee on Government Efficiency, Federalism, and the District of Columbia12/15/1987 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for S.1856.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.1856. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (06/13/1988)

(Measure passed Senate, amended)

National Historical Publications and Records Commission Amendments of 1988 - Revises the membership of the National Historical Publications and Records Commission. Changes its composition from two members to one member from each of the following organizations: (1) the American Historical Association; (2) the Organization of American Historians; (3) the Society of American Archivists; and (4) the American Association for State and Local History. Adds to the Commission one member from the Association for Documentary Editing and one member from the National Association for Government Archives and Records Administrators.

Provides for staggering the terms of certain appointees to the Commission. Entitles all Commission members to travel expenses, including per diem in lieu of subsistence.

Requires the chairman of the Commission to transmit to the President and the Congress from time to time, and at least biennially, the plans, estimates, and recommendations developed and approved by it.

Authorizes the Commission to conduct institutes, training, and educational programs and to sponsor fellowships related to its activities. Authorizes the Commission to disseminate information about documentary sources through guides, directories, and other technical publications.

Authorizes the Commission to recommend the expenditure of appropriated or donated funds for the collecting, describing, preserving, compiling, and publishing of significant documentary sources. Authorizes the Archivist of the United States to make allocations to Federal agencies and grants to State and local public and nonprofit entities after considering the advice and recommendations of the Commission.

Authorizes appropriations to the Commission for FY 1989 through 1993.