Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA]* 11/19/1987
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 11/19/1987
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 11/19/1987
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 11/19/1987
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC]* 11/19/1987
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 11/19/1987
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 11/19/1987
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 11/19/1987
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI]* 11/19/1987
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 11/19/1987
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 11/19/1987
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 11/19/1987
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 11/19/1987
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 11/19/1987
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 11/19/1987
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 11/19/1987
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA]* 11/19/1987
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 11/19/1987
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 11/19/1987
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 11/19/1987
Sen. Weicker, Lowell P., Jr. [R-CT]* 11/19/1987
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 11/19/1987
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 12/21/1987
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 12/21/1987
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 12/21/1987
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 12/21/1987
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 12/21/1987
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 12/21/1987
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT] 12/21/1987
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 12/21/1987
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 12/21/1987
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 12/21/1987
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 12/22/1987
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 02/25/1988
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 02/26/1988
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 03/15/1988
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 03/25/1988
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 06/09/1988