Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Geothermal Steam Act Amendments of 1988

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Geothermal Steam Act Amendments of 1988

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Geothermal Steam Act Amendments

Short Titles as Introduced

Geothermal Steam Act Amendments

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Geothermal Steam Act of 1970 to provide for lease extensions and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (10)

Date Actions Overview
09/22/1988Became Public Law No: 100-443.
09/22/1988Signed by President.
09/13/1988Presented to President.
09/09/1988Resolving differences -- House actions: House Agreed to Senate Amendments to House Amendments by Unanimous Consent.
08/09/1988Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate concurred in the House amendments with an amendment by Voice Vote.
06/13/1988Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
06/13/1988House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
02/16/1988Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote.
02/04/1988Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Johnston with amendments. With written report No. 100-283.
11/20/1987Introduced in Senate

All Actions (23)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/22/1988Became Public Law No: 100-443.
09/22/1988Signed by President.
09/13/1988SenatePresented to President.
09/13/1988SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
09/09/1988HouseHouse Agreed to Senate Amendments to House Amendments by Unanimous Consent.
08/09/1988SenateSenate concurred in the House amendments with an amendment by Voice Vote.
08/09/1988SenateMeasure laid before Senate.
08/09/1988SenateS.Amdt.2830 Amendment SP 2830 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
08/09/1988SenateS.Amdt.2830 Proposed by Senator Byrd for Senator Johnston. The Geothermal Steam Act Amendments of 1988.
06/14/1988SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and held at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
06/13/1988HouseHouse Incorporated H.R.2794 in This Measure as an Amendment.
06/13/1988HousePassed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
06/13/1988HouseCalled up by House by Unanimous Consent.
06/13/1988HouseHouse Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
03/17/1988HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Mining and Natural Resources.
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
02/17/1988HouseReferred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
02/17/1988SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
02/16/1988SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote.
02/04/1988SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 527.
02/04/1988SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Johnston with amendments. With written report No. 100-283.
01/27/1988SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
11/23/1987SenateReferred to Subcommittee on Mineral Resources and Development.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
11/20/1987SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hecht, Chic [R-NV]* 11/20/1987

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources11/20/1987 Referred to
01/27/1988 Markup by
02/04/1988 Reported by S.Rept 100-283
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Mineral Resources Development and Production11/23/1987 Referred to
House Interior and Insular Affairs02/17/1988 Referred to
06/13/1988 Discharged from
House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on Mining and Natural Resources03/17/1988 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.1889. View summaries

Shown Here:
Senate agreed to House amendment with amendment (08/09/1988)

(Senate agreed to House amendments with an amendment)

Geothermal Steam Act Amendments of 1988 - Amends the Geothermal Steam Act of 1970 to remove bona fide sales of geothermal steam as a requirement for geothermal lease extensions. Amends the commercial production or utilization requirement of geothermal steam leases to include wells capable of producing geothermal steam in commercial quantities only if the Secretary of the Interior (the Secretary) determines that diligent efforts are being made towards geothermal steam utilization. Permits extension of lease terms for up to two successive five-year periods even though geothermal steam has not been produced or utilized in commercial quantities by the end of its primary or extended term if the lessee can show bona fide production or utilization efforts and: (1) make annual payments in lieu of the production of commercial quantities; or (2) demonstrate significant expenditures on an annual basis.

Requires the Secretary to review cooperative or unit plans of development on a five-year periodic basis in order to eliminate those leases that are not regarded as reasonably necessary to operations.

Requires the Secretary to maintain a list of National Park System units with significant thermal features and to maintain a monitoring program for such features. Specifies units to be listed. Directs the Secretary to determine if operations proposed by a lease applicant would likely subject significant thermal features within the National Park System to significant adverse effects. Prohibits the issuance of a lease upon such a finding. Mandates that stipulations designed to protect significant thermal features be included in leases and drilling permits.

Requires the Secretary of Agriculture to consider the effects on significant thermal features within units of the National Park System in determining whether to consent to leasing lands under his jurisdiction.

Prohibits the Secretary from issuing a lease for land within the Island Park Geothermal Area. Requires the Secretary to report to the Congress regarding the presence or absence of significant thermal features within Crater Lake National Park. Suspends all geothermal resource production (including leases and drilling permits) in the Corwin Springs Known Geothermal Resources Area until 180 days after the United States Geological Survey has submitted to the Congress an impact study of present and potential geothermal resources development in such areas on thermal features within Yellowstone National Park.