Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Plastic Pollution Control Act of 1987

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

An original bill to study, control, and reduce the pollution of aquatic environments from plastic materials, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (10)

Date Actions Overview
10/28/1988Became Public Law No: 100-556.
10/28/1988Signed by President.
10/20/1988Presented to President.
10/14/1988Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to the House amendments by Voice Vote.
10/04/1988Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
10/04/1988House Committee on Energy and Commerce Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
10/04/1988House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
05/13/1988Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
12/21/1987Committee on Environment and Public Works. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Burdick. With written report No. 100-270.
12/21/1987Introduced in Senate

All Actions (25)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/28/1988Became Public Law No: 100-556.
10/28/1988Signed by President.
10/20/1988SenatePresented to President.
10/20/1988SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
10/18/1988SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/14/1988SenateSenate agreed to the House amendments by Voice Vote.
10/05/1988SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and held at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
10/04/1988HouseHouse Incorporated H.R.5117 in This Measure as an Amendment.
10/04/1988HousePassed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
10/04/1988HouseHouse Committee on Energy and Commerce Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
10/04/1988HouseHouse Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
07/26/1988HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Fisheries and Wildlife Conservation and the Environment
07/26/1988HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Hazardous Materials
05/26/1988HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Fisheries and Wildlife Conservation and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries
05/26/1988HouseExecutive Comment Requested from Commerce, Interior, EPA.
05/24/1988HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Hazardous Materials.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/17/1988HouseReferred to House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
05/17/1988HouseReferred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
05/17/1988SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/13/1988SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
05/13/1988SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
05/13/1988SenateS.Amdt.1976 Amendment SP 1976 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
05/13/1988SenateS.Amdt.1976 Proposed by Senator Thurmond for Senator Chafee. To protect fish and wildlife from plastic ring carrier devices.
12/21/1987SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 513.
12/21/1987SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Burdick. With written report No. 100-270.

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/17/1988 Referred to
10/04/1988 Discharged from
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Hazardous Materials05/24/1988 Referred to
07/26/1988 Hearings by
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries05/17/1988 Referred to
10/04/1988 Discharged from
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Fisheries and Wildlife Conservation and the Environment05/26/1988 Referred to
07/26/1988 Hearings by
Senate Environment and Public Works12/21/1987 Reported original measure S.Rept 100-270

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.1986. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (10/04/1988)

(Measure passed House, amended, in lieu of H.R. 5117)

Title I: Degradable Plastic Ring Carriers - Directs the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency to require, within two years of this Act's enactment, if feasible, that plastic ring carriers (such as those on canned beverage six-packs) which are capable, when discarded, of becoming entangled with fish or wildlife be made of naturally degradable material.

Title II: San Francisco Bay National Wildlife Refuge - Amends Federal law establishing the San Francisco Bay National Wildlife Refuge to expand the boundaries of such refuge to include specified additional lands, marshes, tidal flats, salt ponds, submerged lands, and open waters in the San Francisco Bay Area. Authorizes appropriations for such expansion.