Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Hecht, Chic [R-NV]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Karnes, David K. [R-NE]* 02/04/1988
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 02/04/1988
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 02/04/1988
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 02/16/1988
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 02/16/1988
Sen. Humphrey, Gordon J. [R-NH] 02/16/1988
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 02/23/1988
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 02/26/1988
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 02/26/1988
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/29/1988
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 03/02/1988
Sen. Trible, Paul S., Jr. [R-VA] 03/02/1988
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 03/15/1988
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 03/24/1988
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 03/28/1988
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 03/28/1988
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT] 03/28/1988
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 04/11/1988
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID] 04/19/1988
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 04/22/1988
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 04/27/1988
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 04/29/1988
Sen. Stennis, John C. [D-MS] 05/18/1988
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 06/08/1988
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 06/27/1988
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 07/13/1988
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 07/27/1988
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 07/27/1988
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/27/1988
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 09/07/1988