Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Chiles, Lawton [D-FL]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 02/04/1988
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Humphrey, Gordon J. [R-NH]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Quayle, Dan [R-IN]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Stennis, John C. [D-MS]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Weicker, Lowell P., Jr. [R-CT]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV]* 02/04/1988
Sen. Hecht, Chic [R-NV] 02/16/1988
Sen. Proxmire, William [D-WI] 02/16/1988
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 02/16/1988
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 02/17/1988
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 02/17/1988
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/19/1988
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 02/19/1988
Sen. Trible, Paul S., Jr. [R-VA] 02/19/1988
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 02/23/1988
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT] 02/23/1988
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 02/23/1988
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 02/23/1988
Sen. Karnes, David K. [R-NE] 02/24/1988
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 02/24/1988
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 02/24/1988
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 03/01/1988
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 03/01/1988
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 03/01/1988
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/02/1988
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 03/14/1988
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 03/16/1988
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 03/17/1988
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/28/1988
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 03/29/1988
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 04/14/1988
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 04/20/1988
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 04/27/1988
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 05/09/1988
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 05/24/1988
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 05/24/1988
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID] 05/25/1988
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 05/25/1988
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 06/06/1988
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 06/14/1988