Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to extend for 4 years the authority of the Veterans' Administration to contract for drug and alcohol treatment and rehabilitation services in halfway houses and other certain community-based facilities.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/29/1988Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
06/09/1988Committee on Veterans. Hearings held.
05/19/1988Committee on Veterans received executive comment from VA.
03/07/1988Committee on Veterans requested executive comment from VA, OMB.
02/29/1988Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 02/29/1988
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 06/27/1988

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Veterans' Affairs02/29/1988 Referred to
06/09/1988 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for S.2105.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2105. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/29/1988)

Extends through FY 1992 the authority of the Veterans Administration to contract for drug and alcohol treatment and rehabilitation services in halfway houses and certain other community-based facilities.