Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/04/1988
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 03/29/1988
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/29/1988
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 03/29/1988
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT] 03/29/1988
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 03/29/1988
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 03/29/1988
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/29/1988
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 03/29/1988
Sen. Karnes, David K. [R-NE] 03/29/1988
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 03/29/1988
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/29/1988
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 03/29/1988
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 03/29/1988
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 03/29/1988
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 03/29/1988
Sen. Chiles, Lawton [D-FL] 03/29/1988
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 03/30/1988
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 03/30/1988
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/31/1988
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 03/31/1988
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 04/14/1988
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT] 04/14/1988
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 04/14/1988
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 04/14/1988
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 04/14/1988
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 04/14/1988
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 04/14/1988
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 04/14/1988
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 04/14/1988
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 04/14/1988
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 04/20/1988
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 04/20/1988
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 04/20/1988
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 04/26/1988
Sen. Hecht, Chic [R-NV] 04/26/1988
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 04/27/1988
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 04/28/1988
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 04/28/1988
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 05/09/1988
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 05/09/1988
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID] 05/18/1988