Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 03/16/1988
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 03/16/1988
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/21/1988
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 03/21/1988
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT] 03/21/1988
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 03/21/1988
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/21/1988
Sen. Trible, Paul S., Jr. [R-VA] 03/21/1988
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 03/23/1988
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 03/23/1988
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/23/1988
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/28/1988
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 03/28/1988
Sen. Stennis, John C. [D-MS] 03/28/1988
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 04/21/1988
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 05/27/1988
Sen. McClure, James A. [R-ID] 06/10/1988
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 06/21/1988
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 06/21/1988
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 07/08/1988
Sen. Hecht, Chic [R-NV] 07/08/1988
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 07/12/1988
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 07/14/1988