Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA]* 05/12/1988
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC]* 05/12/1988
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 05/12/1988
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 05/12/1988
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 05/27/1988
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 06/10/1988
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/10/1988
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 06/27/1988
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 07/25/1988
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 08/01/1988
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 08/04/1988
Sen. Hecht, Chic [R-NV] 08/11/1988
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 10/12/1988