Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to delay the implementation of a certain rule affecting the provision of health services by the Indian Health Service.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
09/09/1988Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
08/25/1988Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Inouye under the authority of the order of Aug 11, 88 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 100-493.
05/12/1988Introduced in Senate

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/26/1988HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/16/1988HouseReferred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
09/16/1988HouseReferred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
09/16/1988SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/09/1988SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
08/25/1988SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 915.
08/25/1988SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Inouye under the authority of the order of Aug 11, 88 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 100-493.
07/29/1988SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
06/21/1988SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held.
05/12/1988SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 06/13/1988
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 06/13/1988
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 06/13/1988
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC]* 06/13/1988
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 07/26/1988

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Indian Affairs (Permanent Select)05/12/1988 Referred to
06/21/1988 Hearings by
07/29/1988 Markup by
08/25/1988 Reported by S.Rept 100-493
House Energy and Commerce09/16/1988 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment09/26/1988 Referred to
House Interior and Insular Affairs09/16/1988 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.2382.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.2382. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (09/09/1988)

(Measure passed Senate, amended)

Delays until three years after enactment of this Act the implementation of the final rule published in the Federal Register on September 16, 1987, by the Health Resources and Services Administration relating to eligibility for the health care services of the Indian Health Service (IHS).

Directs the Office of Technology Assessment, acting in consultation with the IHS, to conduct a study to determine the impact of such rule and any other proposed rules which would change eligibility criteria for services of the Indian Health Service. Requires such study to include: (1) the full participation of, and consultation with, Indian and Alaskan Native tribal governments and representatives of urban Indian health care programs; (2) statistics for each IHS service area on the number of Indians who are currently eligible for IHS services, and who would be eligible for such services if the rule or any alternative rules changing eligibility were implemented; and (3) consideration of the financial impact of any such rule on the contract health care and clinical services budgets of the IHS, the health status, cultural, social and economic impact on Indian reservations and urban Indian populations if any such rule were to be implemented, the alternatives, if any, available to those Indians who would lose eligibility, and the program changes that the IHS would be required to make if the eligibility requirements were modified.

Requires the Office of Technology Assessment to submit to the Congress a report on the study within two years after the date of enactment of this Act, after: (1) providing Indian tribes, Alaska Native villages, and urban Indian health care programs an opportunity to comment; and (2) incorporating the comments into the report.

Authorizes appropriations.