Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to extend the low-income housing credit through 1990.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/18/1988Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
05/18/1988Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (52)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 05/18/1988
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Stennis, John C. [D-MS]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Trible, Paul S., Jr. [R-VA]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 06/08/1988
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 06/08/1988
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 06/08/1988
Sen. Weicker, Lowell P., Jr. [R-CT] 06/08/1988
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 06/08/1988
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 06/08/1988
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 06/08/1988
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/21/1988
Sen. Hecht, Chic [R-NV] 06/29/1988
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/29/1988
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/29/1988
Sen. Rudman, Warren [R-NH] 07/06/1988
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 07/06/1988
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 07/12/1988
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/12/1988
Sen. Chiles, Lawton [D-FL] 07/25/1988
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/25/1988
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 08/04/1988
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 09/09/1988
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 09/12/1988

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance05/18/1988 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2411. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/18/1988)

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to extend the low-income housing credit through 1990. (Under current law the credit will expire on December 31, 1989.)