Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 05/18/1988
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Stennis, John C. [D-MS]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Trible, Paul S., Jr. [R-VA]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK]* 05/18/1988
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 06/08/1988
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 06/08/1988
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 06/08/1988
Sen. Weicker, Lowell P., Jr. [R-CT] 06/08/1988
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 06/08/1988
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 06/08/1988
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 06/08/1988
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/21/1988
Sen. Hecht, Chic [R-NV] 06/29/1988
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/29/1988
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/29/1988
Sen. Rudman, Warren [R-NH] 07/06/1988
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 07/06/1988
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 07/12/1988
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/12/1988
Sen. Chiles, Lawton [D-FL] 07/25/1988
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/25/1988
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 08/04/1988
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 09/09/1988
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 09/12/1988