Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 05/27/1988
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 05/27/1988
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 05/27/1988
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 05/27/1988
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 06/06/1988
Sen. Hecht, Chic [R-NV] 06/06/1988
Sen. Karnes, David K. [R-NE] 06/06/1988
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 06/06/1988
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 06/06/1988
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 06/06/1988
Sen. Weicker, Lowell P., Jr. [R-CT] 06/14/1988
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 06/14/1988
Sen. Proxmire, William [D-WI] 06/14/1988
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/14/1988
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 06/14/1988
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/14/1988
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 06/14/1988
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 06/14/1988
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 06/14/1988
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 06/14/1988
Sen. Trible, Paul S., Jr. [R-VA] 06/14/1988
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/14/1988
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 06/14/1988
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/14/1988
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 06/14/1988
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 06/14/1988
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/14/1988
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT] 06/14/1988
Sen. McClure, James A. [R-ID] 06/14/1988
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 06/14/1988
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 06/14/1988
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 06/14/1988
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/14/1988
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 06/14/1988
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 06/14/1988
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 06/14/1988
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/14/1988
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 06/14/1988
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 06/14/1988
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 06/14/1988
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 06/14/1988
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/27/1988
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 06/27/1988
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 06/27/1988
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 06/27/1988
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 06/27/1988
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID] 06/27/1988
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 06/27/1988
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/27/1988
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/27/1988
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 06/27/1988
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 06/27/1988
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/29/1988
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 06/29/1988
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 06/29/1988
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/11/1988
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 07/11/1988
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 07/11/1988
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 07/12/1988
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 07/14/1988
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 07/14/1988
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/14/1988
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 08/02/1988
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 08/05/1988
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 08/05/1988
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 08/05/1988
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 08/05/1988
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 08/10/1988
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 09/09/1988
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 09/09/1988
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 09/09/1988
Sen. Humphrey, Gordon J. [R-NH] 09/13/1988
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 09/13/1988
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 09/14/1988