Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/10/1987
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/10/1987
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 09/22/1987
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT] 09/23/1987
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 09/29/1987
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 09/29/1987
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/29/1987
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/29/1987
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 09/29/1987
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 09/29/1987
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 10/07/1987
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 10/07/1987
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 10/27/1987
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 11/03/1987