Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 02/17/1987
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 02/17/1987
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 02/17/1987
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 02/17/1987
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA]* 02/17/1987
Sen. Zorinsky, Edward [D-NE] 03/03/1987
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/03/1987
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 03/06/1987
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/17/1987
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 03/17/1987
Sen. Trible, Paul S., Jr. [R-VA] 03/27/1987
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 03/30/1987
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 04/22/1987
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 04/22/1987
Sen. Quayle, Dan [R-IN] 04/27/1987
Sen. Karnes, David K. [R-NE] 06/16/1987