There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Defense Authorization Amendments and Base Closure and Realignment Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 1989

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to authorize appropriations for fiscal years 1989 for military activities of the Department of Defense, for military construction, and for defense activities of the Department of Energy, to prescribe personnel strengths for such fiscal year for the Armed Forces, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (13)

Date Actions Overview
10/24/1988Became Public Law No: 100-526.
10/24/1988Signed by President.
10/18/1988Presented to President.
10/12/1988Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report by Yea-Nay Vote. 82-7. Record Vote No: 367.
10/12/1988Conference report agreed to in House: House Agreed to Conference Report by Yea-Nay Vote: 370 - 31 (Record Vote No: 443).
10/11/1988Conference report filed: Conference Report 100-1071 Filed in House.
10/05/1988Conference committee actions: Conferees agreed to file conference report.
10/05/1988Conference committee actions: Conferees agreed to file conference report.
10/05/1988Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate disagreed to the House amendments by Voice Vote.
10/03/1988Resolving differences -- House actions: House Insisted on its Amendments by Voice Vote.
10/03/1988Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
08/11/1988Passed/agreed to in Senate: Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Voice Vote.
08/11/1988Introduced in Senate

All Actions (29)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/24/1988Became Public Law No: 100-526.
10/24/1988Signed by President.
10/18/1988SenatePresented to President.
10/18/1988SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
10/12/1988SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/12/1988SenateSenate agreed to conference report by Yea-Nay Vote. 82-7. Record Vote No: 367.
10/12/1988SenateConference report considered in Senate.
10/12/1988HouseHouse Agreed to Conference Report by Yea-Nay Vote: 370 - 31 (Record Vote No: 443).
10/12/1988HouseRules Committee Resolution H.Res.581 Reported to House.
10/12/1988HouseCommittee on Rules Granted a Rule Waiving All Points of Order Against Consideration of the Conference Report.
10/11/1988HouseConference Report 100-1071 Filed in House.
10/06/1988SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/06/1988SenateConference papers: Senate report and managers' statement and official papers held at the desk in Senate.
10/05/1988Conferees agreed to file conference report.
Action By: Joint
10/05/1988Conferees agreed to file conference report.
Action By: Joint
10/05/1988SenateSenate agreed to request for conference. Appointed conferees. Nunn; Stennis; Exon; Levin; Kennedy; Bingaman; Dixon; Glenn; Gore; Wirth; Shelby; Warner; Thurmond; Humphrey; Cohen; Quayle; Wilson; Gramm; Symms; McCain.
10/05/1988SenateSenate disagreed to the House amendments by Voice Vote.
10/05/1988SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and held at desk: House amendments to Senate bill and House requests a conference.
10/03/1988HouseHouse Requested a Conference and Speaker Appointed Conferees: Aspin, Dellums, Montgomery, Hutto, Skelton, Leath (TX), McCurdy, Foglietta, Hertel, Ortiz, Robinson, Dickinson, Martin (IL), Martin (NY), Ravenel, Weldon, Studds, Young (AK).
10/03/1988HouseHouse Requested a Conference and Speaker Appointed Conferees: Brooks, Conyers, Collins, Horton, Walker, Jones (NC), Davis (MI), Young (AK), Pepper, Moakley, Derrick, Beilenson, Frost, Quillen, Taylor, Foley, Armey.
10/03/1988HouseHouse Insisted on its Amendments by Voice Vote.
10/03/1988HouseOther Measure H.R.4481 Passed House in Lieu.
10/03/1988HousePassed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
10/03/1988HouseCalled up by House by Rule.
09/30/1988HouseRule Passed House.
09/29/1988HouseRules Committee Resolution H.Res.557 Reported to House.
09/29/1988HouseCommittee on Rules Granted a Rule Providing for a Motion to Strike Out All After the Enacting Clause of the Bill and Insert in Lieu Thereof the Provisions of H.R.4481 (Base Closure) as Passed by the House on July 12, 1988; Waiving All Points of Order.
09/07/1988SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/11/1988SenateIntroduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Voice Vote.

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA]* 08/11/1988
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 08/11/1988

Committees (0)

Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).


A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (243)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2749. View summaries

Shown Here:
Conference report filed in House (10/11/1988)

(Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 100-1071)

Defense Authorization Amendments and Base Closure and Realignment Act - Title I: Additional Fiscal Year 1989 Authorization Provisions - Authorizes appropriations for FY 1989 for the following purposes: (1) barracks modernization at Fort Bliss, Texas; (2) the construction of defense access roads at the New Cumberland Army Depot, Pennsylvania; (3) military construction projects at Blytheville Air Force Base, Arkansas; and (4) family housing at Helemano Military Reservation in Hawaii.

Authorizes appropriations for fiscal years beginning after FY 1988 for National Guard and Reserve military construction and land acquisition projects in specified amounts at specified locations.

Limits the obligation of funds for the Army Air Defense system.

Revises provisions relating to multiyear procurement authority to allow the President to request from the Congress relief from the requirement of a certain cost savings that must occur before such a contract is authorized to be entered into.

Amends the National Defense Authorization Act, Fiscal Year 1989 to require a certain report under such Act to be submitted to the Appropriations Committees of the Congress in addition to the Senate and House Armed Services Committees.

Authorizes the President to extend the term of office for the officer serving as Vice Chairman of the Joint Chiefs of Staff until June 1, 1989.

Directs the Secretary of Defense to conduct an independent assessment of Army and Air Force studies and analyses of close air support aircraft alternatives for meeting U.S. military requirements for the period between the assessment and the year 2000, and beyond. Outlines administrative provisions concerning: (1) an operational test plan for a competitive fly-off of aircraft for the close air support mission; (2) the transfer from the Air Force to the Army of the close air support mission; and (3) reports required from the Secretary to the Armed Services and Appropriations Committees on such close air support alternatives.

Amends the National Defense Authorization Act, Fiscal Year 1989 to extend until March 15, 1989, the deadline for a report on the implications of a potential Strategic Arms Reductions Treaty for alternative U.S. forces postures in the 1990's. Requires the President to submit an interim report on such subject as of December 15, 1988.

Waives certain congressional review periods otherwise applicable in the case of the transfer of two specified obsolete submarines.

Title II: Closure and Realignment of Military Installations - Directs the Secretary of Defense to: (1) close or realign all military installations as recommended by the Commission on Base Realignment and Closure; and (2) initiate and complete all such closures and realignments by specified dates. Outlines administrative provisions relating to the following: (1) conditions required of the Secretary and the Commission with regard to such closures and realignments; (2) Commission membership and duties; (3) the implementation of such closures or realignments by the Secretary; (4) the applicability of certain current Federal laws to these provisions; (5) the waiver of certain restrictions in order to carry out these provisions; (6) studies and reports required of the Secretary; (7) funding (through the establishment and deposit of funds into the Department of Defense Base Closure Account); and (8) congressional procedures to be followed with regard to the consideration by both Houses of the Congress of the Commission's report.