Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 01/20/1987
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 01/20/1987
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 01/20/1987
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 01/20/1987
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT]* 01/20/1987
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR]* 01/20/1987
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 01/20/1987
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 01/20/1987
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/20/1987
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 01/20/1987
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA]* 01/20/1987
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 01/22/1987
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 01/22/1987
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 02/03/1987
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 02/04/1987
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 02/04/1987
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 02/19/1987
Sen. Weicker, Lowell P., Jr. [R-CT] 02/19/1987
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 03/03/1987
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 04/01/1987
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 04/01/1987
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 04/07/1987
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 04/28/1987
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 05/08/1987
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 05/19/1987
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/19/1987
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 06/03/1987
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 06/10/1987
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 06/30/1987
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 10/14/1987
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 11/19/1987
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 12/21/1987
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 02/22/1988
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 04/13/1988