Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI]* 01/21/1987
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN]* 01/21/1987
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 01/21/1987
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 01/21/1987
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 01/21/1987
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 01/22/1987
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 01/27/1987
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 02/17/1987
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/17/1987
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/03/1987
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 04/03/1987
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT] 06/23/1987
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 07/17/1987
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 12/16/1987
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 03/30/1988
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 06/07/1988