Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Trible, Paul S., Jr. [R-VA]* 02/04/1987
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 03/03/1987
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/06/1987
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 03/17/1987
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID] 03/25/1987
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 04/24/1987
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 05/05/1987
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 05/06/1987
Sen. Humphrey, Gordon J. [R-NH] 05/15/1987
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/20/1987
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 06/16/1987

Show cosponsors who withdrew