Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 03/11/1987
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 04/02/1987
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/06/1987
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 04/09/1987
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 04/10/1987
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 04/21/1987
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 05/06/1987
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/13/1987
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 05/20/1987
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 07/14/1987
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 03/22/1988
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 03/22/1988
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 03/22/1988
Sen. Weicker, Lowell P., Jr. [R-CT] 03/22/1988
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 06/16/1988