Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 02/05/1987
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 02/05/1987
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 02/05/1987
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 02/05/1987
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 02/05/1987
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 02/05/1987
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 02/05/1987
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 02/19/1987
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/19/1987
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/03/1987
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 03/03/1987
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/19/1987
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 03/19/1987
Sen. Quayle, Dan [R-IN] 03/19/1987
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 03/19/1987
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 03/19/1987
Sen. Weicker, Lowell P., Jr. [R-CT] 03/19/1987
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT] 03/19/1987
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/19/1987
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 03/19/1987
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 03/20/1987
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 03/20/1987
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 03/20/1987
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 03/20/1987
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 03/20/1987
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 03/20/1987
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 03/23/1987
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 03/24/1987
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/24/1987
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/24/1987
Sen. Evans, Daniel J. [R-WA] 03/24/1987
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/25/1987
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 03/25/1987
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 03/27/1987
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 03/27/1987
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 03/27/1987
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/27/1987
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 03/27/1987
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/30/1987
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 03/30/1987
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 03/30/1987
Sen. McClure, James A. [R-ID] 03/30/1987
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 04/01/1987
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 04/01/1987
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 04/01/1987
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 04/01/1987
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 04/01/1987
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/02/1987