Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Stennis, John C. [D-MS]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 02/19/1987
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 02/19/1987
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 02/19/1987
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Trible, Paul S., Jr. [R-VA]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT] 03/25/1987
Sen. Weicker, Lowell P., Jr. [R-CT] 03/25/1987
Sen. Rudman, Warren [R-NH] 03/25/1987
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 03/25/1987
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 03/25/1987
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 03/26/1987
Sen. Proxmire, William [D-WI] 03/26/1987
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 03/26/1987
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/26/1987
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 04/08/1987
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/21/1987
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 04/21/1987
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 06/05/1987
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/17/1987
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/27/1988