Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA]* 02/26/1987
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 02/26/1987
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 02/26/1987
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 03/12/1987
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/12/1987
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 05/20/1987
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/30/1987
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 06/30/1987
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/30/1987
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 06/30/1987
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 07/08/1987
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 07/08/1987
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 07/15/1987
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 07/15/1987
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 07/15/1987
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 07/22/1987
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/22/1987
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 07/22/1987
Sen. Chiles, Lawton [D-FL] 07/22/1987
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 07/22/1987
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 07/22/1987
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 07/22/1987
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 08/05/1987
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 08/07/1987
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 12/08/1987
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 12/08/1987
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT] 12/16/1987
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 02/24/1988
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 02/24/1988
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 02/24/1988
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 02/24/1988
Sen. Karnes, David K. [R-NE] 03/17/1988
Sen. Hecht, Chic [R-NV] 03/17/1988
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/17/1988
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/17/1988
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 04/15/1988
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 04/15/1988
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 04/15/1988
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 04/15/1988
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 04/15/1988
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 04/21/1988
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 08/09/1988