Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL]* 03/06/1987
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/18/1987
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 03/18/1987
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/18/1987
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID] 03/18/1987
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 03/18/1987
Sen. Stennis, John C. [D-MS] 03/18/1987
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/18/1987
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/18/1987
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 03/18/1987
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 03/18/1987
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/26/1987
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 03/26/1987
Sen. Hecht, Chic [R-NV] 03/26/1987
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 03/26/1987
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 03/26/1987
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 03/26/1987
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 03/26/1987
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/31/1987
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 04/23/1987
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 04/23/1987