Summary: S.675 — 100th Congress (1987-1988)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Indefinitely postponed in Senate (07/28/1988)

(Measure indefinitely postponed in Senate, H.R. 1467 passed in lieu)

Amends the Endangered Species Act (the Act) to redefine the term "person" to include any State, municipality, or political subdivision of a State, or any other entity subject to the jurisdiction of the United States.

Gives the Secretary of the Interior, through the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, enforcement authority over the import and export of protected plants.

Directs the Secretary of the Interior to monitor the status of species identified as candidates for the endangered species list, using the emergency listing authority to prevent a significant risk to any such species.

Permits the regulation of commerce or taking (rather than both) for species similar in appearance to other listed species.

Directs the Secretary of the Interior to develop, implement, and report annually to the Congress on recovery plans for the conservation and survival of listed endangered and threatened species on a priority basis without regard to the taxonomic classification.

Directs the Secretary of the Interior, prior to the final approval of a new or revised recovery plan, to provide public notice and an opportunity for public review and comment on such plan and to consider all information presented during such public comment period. Requires each Federal agency to consider all information prior to plan implementation.

Directs the Secretary of the Interior to implement, in cooperation with the States, a five year monitoring program for recovered species.

Authorizes grants to States for monitoring programs for candidate and recovered species. Establishes a cooperative endangered species conservation fund based on a percentage of funds credited to the Sport Fishing Restoration Account to finance such grants.

Makes it unlawful to maliciously damage or destroy any endangered plant species on Federal lands or to remove or damage such species in violation of State law.

Increases civil and criminal penalties for violations of the Act. Makes sums available for deposit in the cooperative endangered species conservation fund.

Directs the Secretary of Commerce to delay the effective date of specified regulations relating to sea turtle conservation until May 1, 1990, in inshore areas, and until May 1, 1989, in offshore areas, except that regulations already in effect in the Canaveral area of Florida shall remain in effect. Makes the inshore area regulations effective beginning May 1, 1990, unless the Secretary of Commerce determines that other conservation measures are proving equally effective in reducing sea turtle mortality by shrimp trawling, and modifies the regulations accordingly.

Directs the Secretary of Commerce to contract for a independent review of scientific information pertaining to the conservation of each of the relevant species of sea turtles, to be conducted by the National Academy of Sciences with experts not employed by Federal or State government. Sets forth the purposes and scope of such review. Directs the Secretary of Commerce to submit such review, with recommendations, to specified congressional committees by April 1, 1989. Requires the review panel, if such review cannot be completed by deadline, to give priority to completing that portion relating to the Kemp's ridley sea turtle and to complete the remainder as soon as possible. Sets forth items for the Secretary of Commerce to consider before making such recommendations.

Authorizes the Secretary of Commerce to modify, for good cause, regulations relating to sea turtle conservation.

Directs the Secretary of Commerce, either directly or by contract, to instruct fishermen in the use of the turtle excluder device or any other required device.

Directs the National Marine Fisheries Service to designate a Sea Turtle Coordinator to establish and carry out an effective, long-term sea turtle program.

Extends through 1992 the authorization of appropriations to the Departments of the Interior, of Commerce, and of Agriculture to carry out the Act.

Directs the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA), in cooperation with the Secretaries of Agriculture and of the Interior, to engage in an informational program directed at the agricultural food and fiber commodity production community concerning existing or proposed requirements under the Endangered Species Act of 1973, including pesticide label change requirements.

Requires the Administrator of EPA and the Secretaries of Agriculture and of the Interior to jointly study and report to specified congressional committee chairmen on the economic impact of implementing the endangered species pesticide labeling program. Requires an interim report by September 15, 1988, and a final report within one year after enactment of this Act.

Renews for a six-month period certificates of exemption from the prohibition against sale of scrimshaw products and unworked whale ivory for certificate-holders whose certificates were renewed after October 13, 1982, and were in effect on March 31, 1988. Allows such certificate-holders to apply for one additional renewal for a period not to exceed five years.

Prohibits, after January 31, 1984, any person from selling or offering for sale in interstate or foreign commerce, any pre-Act finished scrimshaw product unless such person holds a certificate of exemption and unless the product or raw material for the product was held by such person on October 13, 1982.

Directs the Secretary of the Interior, through the Fish and Wildlife Service, to report annually to the Congress an accounting of all Federal expenditures under the Act, and all expenditures by States receiving cost sharing under the Act, listed on a species-by-species basis.