Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 03/10/1987
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 03/17/1987
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 03/25/1987
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 03/27/1987
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 03/27/1987
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 04/10/1987
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 05/20/1987
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 07/01/1987
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT] 02/16/1988
Sen. Hecht, Chic [R-NV] 03/28/1988
Sen. McClure, James A. [R-ID] 03/29/1988
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID] 04/11/1988

Show cosponsors who withdrew