Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Omnibus Insular Areas Act of 1988

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Indian Development Finance Corporation Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Indian Development Finance Corporation Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Indian Development Finance Corporation Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for and promote the economic development of Indian tribes by furnishing the necessary capital, financial services, and technical assistance to Indian owned business enterprises and to stimulate the development of the private sector of Indian tribal economies.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
10/19/1988Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
04/20/1988Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
03/22/1988Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Inouye with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 100-306.
03/11/1987Introduced in Senate

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
10/20/1988SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and held at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
10/19/1988HousePassed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
10/19/1988HouseCalled up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
04/26/1988HouseReferred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
04/26/1988SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
04/20/1988SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
04/20/1988SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
04/20/1988SenateS.Amdt.1972 Amendment SP 1972 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
04/20/1988SenateS.Amdt.1972 Proposed by Senator Byrd for Senator Inouye. To provide for technical amendments.
03/22/1988SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 596.
03/22/1988SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Inouye with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 100-306.
Action By: Permanent Select Committee on Indian Affairs
03/03/1988SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Action By: Permanent Select Committee on Indian Affairs
10/15/1987SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held.
Action By: Permanent Select Committee on Indian Affairs
04/30/1987SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held.
Action By: Permanent Select Committee on Indian Affairs
03/11/1987SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.

Cosponsors (7)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Indian Affairs03/11/1987 Referred to
10/15/1987 Hearings by
03/03/1988 Markup by
03/22/1988 Reported by S.Rept 100-306
House Interior and Insular Affairs04/26/1988 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.721. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (10/19/1988)

(Measure passed House, amended)

Omnibus Insular Areas Act of 1988 - Authorizes the Ninth Judicial Circuit of the United States to provide assistance to the courts of the freely associated States (Micronesia, the Marshall Islands, and Palau). Permits the Chief Justice of the United States or the chief judge of the Ninth Judicial Circuit to authorize any circuit judge of, or district judge within, the Ninth Circuit to serve temporarily as a judge of any court of a freely associated State.

Authorizes the President to negotiate agreements which provide that: (1) the United States will regulate the distribution of controlled substances in the freely associated States; and (2) the freely associated States will be treated as foreign countries for the purposes of such distribution if they agree to international conventions on distribution.

Designates the Northern Marianas College as a depository to receive Government publications and directs the Superintendent of Documents to supply to the College one copy of each such publication.

Waives the requirement for local matching funds in order to have a Federal program or project apply to, or take place in, the Insular Areas.

Amends the Revised Organic Act of the Virgin Islands to repeal the requirements that the District Court of the Virgin Islands for the Division of Saint Croix be held in Christiansted and for the Division of Saint Thomas and Saint John at Charlotte Amalie.

Increases to 50 percent (currently, 30 percent) the amount Guam may use for port development and not pay to the Federal Government.

Authorizes such sums as may be necessary for the design and construction of the Nanpil River hydropower diversion project in the Federated States of Micronesia.