Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN]* 05/14/1987
Sen. Karnes, David K. [R-NE] 05/27/1987
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 05/27/1987
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/27/1987
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 05/29/1987
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 05/29/1987
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT] 06/11/1987
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 06/16/1987
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 09/16/1987