Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 01/27/1987
Sen. Proxmire, William [D-WI] 01/27/1987
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 01/27/1987
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 02/02/1987
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 02/02/1987
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 02/19/1987
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 02/19/1987
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 02/19/1987
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/19/1987
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 02/19/1987
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/19/1987
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 02/19/1987
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/19/1987
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/19/1987
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 02/19/1987
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 02/19/1987
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 02/19/1987
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 02/23/1987
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 02/23/1987
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 02/23/1987
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT] 02/23/1987
Sen. Weicker, Lowell P., Jr. [R-CT] 02/26/1987
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 02/26/1987
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 03/12/1987
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 03/19/1987
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 03/19/1987
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 03/19/1987
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 04/27/1987
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 04/27/1987
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 04/27/1987
Sen. Chiles, Lawton [D-FL] 06/05/1987
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/05/1987
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 07/30/1987
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 09/10/1987