Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 03/23/1987
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 03/23/1987
Sen. Chiles, Lawton [D-FL]* 03/23/1987
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA]* 03/23/1987
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 03/23/1987
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO]* 03/23/1987
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL]* 03/23/1987
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 03/23/1987
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 03/23/1987
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH]* 03/23/1987
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN]* 03/23/1987
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR]* 03/23/1987
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA]* 03/23/1987
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI]* 03/23/1987
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/23/1987
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/23/1987
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 03/23/1987
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 03/23/1987
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 03/23/1987
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 03/23/1987
Sen. Weicker, Lowell P., Jr. [R-CT]* 03/23/1987
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 03/23/1987
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA]* 03/23/1987
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 03/23/1987
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 03/23/1987
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 03/23/1987
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 03/23/1987
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 03/24/1987
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 03/24/1987
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 03/24/1987
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/24/1987
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 03/25/1987
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 03/25/1987
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 03/26/1987
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 03/27/1987
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 04/03/1987
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 04/06/1987
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 04/07/1987
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 04/07/1987
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 04/09/1987