Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Weicker, Lowell P., Jr. [R-CT]* 03/24/1987
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 03/24/1987
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 03/24/1987
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR]* 03/24/1987
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN]* 03/24/1987
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 03/24/1987
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 03/24/1987
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL]* 03/24/1987
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 03/24/1987
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN]* 03/24/1987
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 03/24/1987
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT]* 03/24/1987
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/24/1987
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 03/24/1987
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI]* 03/24/1987
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX]* 03/24/1987
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 03/24/1987
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 03/24/1987
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE]* 03/24/1987
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 03/24/1987
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA]* 03/24/1987
Sen. Hecht, Chic [R-NV]* 03/24/1987
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 03/24/1987
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 03/24/1987
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 03/24/1987
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 03/24/1987
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 03/26/1987
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 04/01/1987
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 04/03/1987
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 04/09/1987
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 04/09/1987
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 04/21/1987
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/21/1987
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 04/21/1987
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/21/1987
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 04/21/1987
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 04/22/1987
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 04/27/1987
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 04/29/1987
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 04/29/1987
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 07/08/1987
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 07/10/1987
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 07/29/1987
Sen. Karnes, David K. [R-NE] 09/17/1987
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 10/06/1987