Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Evans, Daniel J. [R-WA]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA]* 01/06/1987
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Proxmire, William [D-WI]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Weicker, Lowell P., Jr. [R-CT]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Quayle, Dan [R-IN]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 01/12/1987
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 01/12/1987
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 01/12/1987
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 01/12/1987
Sen. Trible, Paul S., Jr. [R-VA] 01/12/1987
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 01/21/1987
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 01/21/1987
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 01/21/1987
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 01/21/1987
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 01/21/1987
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 01/28/1987
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 01/28/1987
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 01/28/1987
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 01/28/1987
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 01/28/1987
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 02/02/1987
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 02/02/1987
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 02/02/1987
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT] 02/02/1987
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 02/02/1987
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 02/03/1987
Sen. Chiles, Lawton [D-FL] 02/03/1987
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 02/03/1987
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 02/03/1987
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 02/03/1987
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 02/03/1987
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 02/03/1987
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/04/1987
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 02/04/1987
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 02/04/1987
Sen. Rudman, Warren [R-NH] 02/04/1987
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 02/04/1987
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 02/04/1987
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 02/04/1987
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 02/05/1987
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 02/05/1987
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 02/05/1987
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 02/05/1987
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/05/1987
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 02/05/1987
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 02/05/1987