Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN]* 03/25/1987
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 03/25/1987
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/25/1987
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 03/25/1987
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 03/25/1987
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 04/02/1987
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 04/02/1987
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 04/10/1987
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT] 04/10/1987
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 04/29/1987
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 05/20/1987
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 05/28/1987
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 06/16/1987
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 06/26/1987
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 06/26/1987
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 06/26/1987
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 06/26/1987
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/14/1987
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 07/14/1987
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 07/14/1987
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 07/21/1987
Sen. Trible, Paul S., Jr. [R-VA] 07/28/1987
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 07/28/1987
Sen. Hecht, Chic [R-NV] 07/29/1987
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 08/06/1987
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 08/06/1987
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 08/06/1987
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 09/10/1987
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/10/1987
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 09/10/1987
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 09/22/1987
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 09/22/1987
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 09/25/1987
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 10/16/1987
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 10/16/1987
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 11/03/1987
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 11/03/1987
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 11/03/1987
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 11/03/1987
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 11/03/1987
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 11/03/1987
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 11/03/1987
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 11/17/1987
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 11/17/1987
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 11/17/1987
Sen. Karnes, David K. [R-NE] 12/02/1987
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 12/16/1987
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 12/18/1987
Sen. McClure, James A. [R-ID] 01/26/1988
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT] 02/02/1988
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 02/26/1988
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 03/24/1988
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/09/1988
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 05/26/1988
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 09/07/1988