Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Truck and Bus Safety Act of 1987

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Truck and Bus Safety Act of 1987

Short Titles as Introduced

Truck and Bus Safety Act of 1987

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require certain actions by the Secretary of Transportation regarding certain drivers of motor vehicles and motor carriers.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
03/03/1988Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
12/19/1987Committee on Commerce. Reported to Senate by Senator Hollings with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 100-267.
03/26/1987Introduced in Senate

All Actions (7)

Date
03/08/1988Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Action By: Senate
03/03/1988Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
Action By: Senate
12/19/1987Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 510.
Action By: Senate
12/19/1987Committee on Commerce. Reported to Senate by Senator Hollings with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 100-267.
11/19/1987Committee on Commerce. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
07/15/1987Subcommittee on Surface Transportation. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation Subcommittee on Surface Transportation
03/26/1987Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
Action By: Senate

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation03/26/1987 Referred to
11/19/1987 Markup by
12/19/1987 Reported by S.Rept 100-267
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation Subcommittee on Surface Transportation07/15/1987 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for S.861.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.861. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (03/03/1988)

(Measure passed Senate, amended)

Truck and Bus Safety Act of 1987 - Directs the Secretary of Transportation to: (1) include within the ambit of Federal motor carrier safety regulations motor carriers and drivers operating wholly within a municipality or commercial zone of a municipality (with specified exceptions); (2) initiate rulemaking proceedings on the need to adopt specified methods for safety improvement (including vehicle onboard monitoring devices in trucks to be used solely for the purpose of monitoring driver productivity); and (3) report to the Congress by September 30, 1988, on the need to adopt methods for improving braking performance standards for trucks and truck trailers.

Mandates that the appropriate authorizing congressional committees conduct oversight hearings by October 31, 1988, to obtain public testimony regarding the Secretary's report.

Directs the Secretary to initiate rulemaking proceedings by December 1, 1988, regarding the need to adopt methods for improving braking performance standards for trucks and truck trailers.