Committees: S.887 — 100th Congress (1987-1988)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Labor and Human Resources03/31/1987 Referred to
07/22/1987 Markup by
07/29/1987 Reported by S.Rept 100-136
Senate Labor and Human Resources Subcommittee on Aging04/06/1987 Referred to
07/07/1987 Hearings by
07/07/1987 Markup by
07/07/1987 Reported by
Senate Indian Affairs07/29/1987 Referred to
07/30/1987 Markup by
08/03/1987 Reported by S.Rept 100-140