Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 04/07/1987
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 04/07/1987
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 04/07/1987
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN]* 04/07/1987
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 04/07/1987
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 04/07/1987
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 04/07/1987
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 04/07/1987
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/19/1987
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 05/19/1987
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/09/1987
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/11/1987
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 09/11/1987