Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 04/09/1987
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 04/09/1987
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH]* 04/09/1987
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 06/10/1987
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/11/1987
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 06/11/1987
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/11/1987
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 06/11/1987
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/11/1987
Sen. McClure, James A. [R-ID] 06/24/1987
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 06/24/1987
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 06/24/1987
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 06/24/1987
Sen. Karnes, David K. [R-NE] 06/24/1987
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 06/24/1987
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 06/24/1987
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/24/1987
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 07/10/1987
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 07/17/1987
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 09/11/1987