Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA]* 03/14/1988
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 03/25/1988
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 04/11/1988
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 04/12/1988
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/25/1988
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 04/26/1988
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 05/09/1988
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 05/11/1988
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 05/11/1988
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/12/1988
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 05/20/1988
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 05/20/1988
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 05/25/1988
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 06/06/1988
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT] 06/06/1988
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 06/06/1988
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 06/09/1988
Sen. Armstrong, William L. [R-CO] 06/21/1988
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/21/1988
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 06/21/1988
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 06/22/1988
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 06/27/1988
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 06/28/1988
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 06/28/1988
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 06/28/1988
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID] 06/29/1988
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/29/1988
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/06/1988
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 07/06/1988
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 07/07/1988
Sen. Karnes, David K. [R-NE] 07/07/1988
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 07/07/1988
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 07/11/1988
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 07/11/1988
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/12/1988
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 07/12/1988
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 07/13/1988
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 07/13/1988
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/13/1988
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/25/1988
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 07/25/1988
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 07/26/1988
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 07/26/1988
Sen. Quayle, Dan [R-IN] 07/27/1988
Sen. McClure, James A. [R-ID] 07/29/1988
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 07/29/1988
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 08/02/1988
Sen. Humphrey, Gordon J. [R-NH] 08/02/1988
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 08/04/1988
Sen. Hecht, Chic [R-NV] 08/04/1988
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 08/08/1988
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 08/08/1988
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 08/09/1988
Sen. Trible, Paul S., Jr. [R-VA] 08/11/1988

Show cosponsors who withdrew