Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 08/04/1988
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 08/04/1988
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 08/04/1988
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 08/04/1988
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 08/11/1988
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 08/11/1988
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 08/11/1988
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 08/11/1988
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 08/11/1988
Sen. Humphrey, Gordon J. [R-NH] 08/11/1988
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 08/11/1988
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 08/11/1988
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 08/11/1988
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 08/11/1988
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 08/11/1988
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 08/11/1988
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 09/08/1988
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 09/13/1988
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 09/15/1988
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 09/15/1988
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT] 09/15/1988
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/20/1988
Sen. Hecht, Chic [R-NV] 09/20/1988
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 09/20/1988
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 09/22/1988
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 09/26/1988
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 09/26/1988
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 09/26/1988
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 09/26/1988
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 09/26/1988
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 09/26/1988
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 09/30/1988
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 09/30/1988
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/30/1988
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 10/05/1988
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 10/05/1988
Sen. Trible, Paul S., Jr. [R-VA] 10/05/1988
Sen. Evans, Daniel J. [R-WA] 10/05/1988
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 10/06/1988
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 10/06/1988
Sen. Karnes, David K. [R-NE] 10/06/1988
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 10/07/1988
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 10/07/1988
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 10/07/1988
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 10/07/1988
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 10/07/1988
Sen. Stennis, John C. [D-MS] 10/07/1988
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 10/07/1988
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 10/14/1988
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 10/14/1988
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 10/14/1988
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 10/19/1988
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 10/19/1988