Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY]* 02/05/1987
Sen. Zorinsky, Edward [D-NE]* 02/05/1987
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 02/26/1987
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 03/03/1987
Sen. Weicker, Lowell P., Jr. [R-CT] 03/03/1987
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 03/11/1987
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 03/11/1987
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 03/11/1987
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 03/11/1987
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/11/1987
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT] 03/11/1987
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 03/11/1987
Sen. Hecht, Chic [R-NV] 03/17/1987
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/17/1987
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 03/17/1987
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 03/17/1987
Sen. Trible, Paul S., Jr. [R-VA] 03/20/1987
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 03/20/1987
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/20/1987
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 03/20/1987
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 03/23/1987
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 03/23/1987
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 03/26/1987
Sen. Stennis, John C. [D-MS] 03/27/1987
Sen. Quayle, Dan [R-IN] 03/30/1987
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 03/30/1987
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/30/1987
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 03/30/1987
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 04/06/1987
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 04/07/1987
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 04/08/1987
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 04/21/1987
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/21/1987
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 04/24/1987
Sen. Karnes, David K. [R-NE] 04/27/1987
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 04/30/1987
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID] 05/08/1987
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 05/08/1987
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 05/13/1987
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 05/19/1987
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 05/27/1987
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/03/1987
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/19/1987
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/10/1987
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 09/16/1987
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 10/20/1987