Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Zorinsky, Edward [D-NE]* 02/19/1987
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Quayle, Dan [R-IN]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 02/26/1987
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 02/26/1987
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 02/26/1987
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 02/26/1987
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 03/03/1987
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 03/06/1987
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 03/10/1987
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 03/10/1987
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 03/10/1987
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 03/12/1987
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 03/12/1987
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 03/12/1987
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 03/12/1987
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 03/17/1987
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 03/24/1987
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/26/1987
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/26/1987
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 03/26/1987
Sen. Karnes, David K. [R-NE] 03/26/1987
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 03/26/1987