Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 02/26/1987
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 02/26/1987
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 02/26/1987
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 02/26/1987
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 02/26/1987
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA]* 02/26/1987
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 02/26/1987
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT]* 02/26/1987
Sen. Trible, Paul S., Jr. [R-VA] 03/17/1987
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 04/24/1987
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 06/11/1987
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 06/11/1987
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 06/17/1987
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 06/17/1987
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 06/23/1987
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 06/26/1987
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 06/26/1987
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 06/26/1987
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 06/26/1987
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 06/30/1987
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 07/08/1987
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 07/10/1987
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 07/10/1987
Sen. Stennis, John C. [D-MS] 07/10/1987
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 07/17/1987
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/17/1987
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/22/1987
Sen. McClure, James A. [R-ID] 07/22/1987
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/22/1987
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT] 07/29/1987
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 07/29/1987
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 07/30/1987
Sen. Weicker, Lowell P., Jr. [R-CT] 07/30/1987
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 07/30/1987
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 08/06/1987
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 08/06/1987
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 09/09/1987
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 09/09/1987
Sen. Chiles, Lawton [D-FL] 09/09/1987
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 09/09/1987
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/11/1987
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 09/15/1987
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 09/16/1987
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 09/22/1987
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/22/1987
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 09/24/1987
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 10/14/1987
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 11/10/1987
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 11/10/1987
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 11/18/1987
Sen. Hecht, Chic [R-NV] 11/20/1987
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 11/20/1987
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 11/20/1987
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 11/20/1987
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 12/01/1987