Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 03/11/1987
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/17/1987
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 03/18/1987
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 03/19/1987
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/25/1987
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 03/25/1987
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/26/1987
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/26/1987
Sen. Karnes, David K. [R-NE] 03/26/1987